Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464625

EP3464625 - NOVEL MUTATIONS IN ANAPLASTIC LYMPHOMA KINASE PREDICTING RESPONSE TO ALK INHIBITOR THERAPY IN LUNG CANCER PATIENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  20.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
For:DE 
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Straße 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / LOVEJOY, Alexander
36286 Salisbury Drive
Newark, CA 94560 / US
02 / YAUNG, Stephanie
1137 Queensbridge Way
San Jose, CA 95210 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Burger, Alexander , et al
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Patentabteilung
Nonnenwald 2
82377 Penzberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Burger, Alexander , et al
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department (LPP.....6164) P.O.Box 11 52
82372 Penzberg / DE
Application number, filing date17728807.301.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP63318
Priority number, dateUS201662344297P01.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662344297 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017207696
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464625
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:NEUARTIGE MUTATIONEN BEI DER ANAPLASTISCHEN LYMPHOMKINASE ZUR VORHERSAGE DER REAKTION AUF DIE ALK-INHIBITOR-THERAPIE BEI LUNGENKREBSPATIENTEN[2019/15]
English:NOVEL MUTATIONS IN ANAPLASTIC LYMPHOMA KINASE PREDICTING RESPONSE TO ALK INHIBITOR THERAPY IN LUNG CANCER PATIENTS[2019/15]
French:NOUVELLES MUTATIONS DANS LA RÉPONSE DE PRÉDICTION DE LA KINASE DU LYMPHOME ANAPLASIQUE À UNE THÉRAPIE PAR INHIBITEUR D'ALK CHEZ DES PATIENTS ATTEINTS DU CANCER DU POUMON[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
02.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP2711435  (ARKRAY INC [JP]) [X] 15 * the whole document * [I] 13;
 [A]WO2012158880  (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]; XING MICHAEL MINGZHAO [US]; KANNAN MURUGAN AV) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [XI]WO2011095894  (UNIV JICHI MEDICAL [JP]; MANO HIROYUKI [JP]; CHOI YOUNG L [JP]; SODA M) [X] 15 * the whole document * [I] 13;
 [XI]WO2013074518  (TESARO INC [US]) [X] 15 * the whole document * [I] 13;
 [I]WO2014182521  (MEDIMMUNE LLC [US]; SHANGHAI CHEST HOSPITAL [CN]) [I] 13 * the whole document *;
 [XP]WO2016094248  (SLOAN KETTERING INST CANCER [US]) [XP] 1,12 * the whole document *
by applicantUS8586299
 US5871908
 US7700339
 US2016304937
 US2014296081
 US2016032396
    - WEKKEN et al., Crit. Rev. One. Hematol., (20160000), vol. 100, page 107
    - VAN DER WEKKEN et al., Crit. Rev. One. Hematol., (20160000), vol. 100, page 107
    - TYAGI et al., Nat. Biotechnol., (19960000), vol. 3, pages 303 - 308
    - WHITCOMBE et al., Nat. Biotechnol., (19990000), vol. 8, pages 804 - 807
    - HOLLAND et al., P.N.A.S. USA, (19910000), vol. 88, pages 7276 - 7280
 US20080330694