Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469211

EP3469211 - ROTOR BLADE, WIND TURBINE AND METHOD FOR INSTALLING AND PRODUCING A ROTOR BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  20.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wobben Properties GmbH
Borsigstrasse 26
26607 Aurich / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / RUBNER, Florian
Virchowstraße 3
26607 Aurich / DE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17728845.309.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP64084
Priority number, dateDE20161011074710.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016110747
[2019/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212017
Date:14.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469211
Date:17.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F03D1/06, F03D13/10, B66C1/10
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:ROTORBLATT, WINDENERGIEANLAGE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE UND ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ROTORBLATTES[2019/16]
English:ROTOR BLADE, WIND TURBINE AND METHOD FOR INSTALLING AND PRODUCING A ROTOR BLADE[2019/16]
French:PALE DE ROTOR, ÉOLIENNE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE ET DE FABRICATION D'UNE PALE DE ROTOR[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
10.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2015316028  (BREKENFELD ZACHARY [US]) [X] 1-4,8-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0040] - [0045] * [A] 5-7,13,14;
 [XA]DE102011051574  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 13,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0023] * [A] 1-12;
 [XA]WO2012163358  (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK], et al) [X] 13,14 * abstract * * page 8, line 28 - page 10, line 17 * [A] 1-12;
 [XA]US2013236324  (BECH ANTON [DK], et al) [X] 13,14 * abstract * [A] 1-12;
 [XA]WO2004070203  (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [X] 13 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph l - page 5, paragraph 2 * [A] 1-12,14;
 [A]US2013149154  (KUROIWA TAKAO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0084] *
by applicantDE102011076937