Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3471912 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3471912



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 221
23.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.07.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
23.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
23.07.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
23.07.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
23.07.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
23.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.07.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
04.07.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
02.07.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.01.2019 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 10
03.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
03.12.2018 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
03.12.2018 Priority search results Search / examination 5
03.12.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
08.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 40
21.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
21.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
21.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 41
21.08.2017 ISR: cited documents (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
21.08.2017 International Search Report - copy in English for the IB International Searching Authority 3
18.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
18.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
18.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 6
22.06.2017 Notification of receipt of Search copy (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
21.06.2017 Incoming letter related to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 1
20.06.2017 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 5
14.06.2017 Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 1
12.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
12.06.2017 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
12.06.2017 Claims PCT receiving Office 7
12.06.2017 Description PCT receiving Office 22
12.06.2017 Document concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 2
12.06.2017 Drawings PCT receiving Office 10
12.06.2017 Electronic request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 4