Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3471912


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019 Change - extension states published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
02.08.2019 Change - divisional application(s) published on  04.09.2019  [2019/36]
24.07.2019 Amendment by applicant
09.07.2019 Change - representative
28.06.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
22.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
25.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
07.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
03.12.2018 Change - representative
03.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
05.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
28.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
20.06.2017 PCT data prior to European publication