Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471912

EP3471912 - DISPERSION ADJUSTMENT UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  20.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRUMPF Laser GmbH
Aichhalder Strasse 39
78713 Schramberg / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / BUDNICKI, Aleksander
Schönbergstrasse 5B
79194 Gundelfingen / DE
02 / SCELLE, Raphael
Charles de Gaullestrasse 51
78050 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b
82319 Starnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
Application number, filing date17728870.112.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP64228
Priority number, dateDE20161011094715.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016110947
[2019/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216083
Date:21.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471912
Date:24.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B23K26/06, H01S3/10, H01S3/13, H01S5/00, H01S3/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:DISPERSIONSANPASSUNGSEINHEIT[2019/17]
English:DISPERSION ADJUSTMENT UNIT[2019/17]
French:UNITÉ D'ADAPTATION DE DISPERSION[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase03.12.2018National basic fee paid 
03.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
03.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Divisional application(s)EP19188649.8
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XAYI]WO2010028837  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [X] 23,24,26 * the whole document * [A] 14,19,20,25 [Y] 1-13,15-18,21 [I] 2-9,11-13,15-18,21;
 [YD]DE102010018967  (ZEISS CARL MICROIMAGING GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-13,15-18,21 * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043] * * figure 3 *;
 [A]DE19531059  (IMRA AMERICA INC [US]) [A] 1-26 * column 5, line 2 - paragraph 47 * * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2933882  (DEUTSCHES ELEKTRONEN SYNCHR [DE], et al) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2015117128
 US7822347
 US7729045
 US8780440
 DE102010018967
 US2008304127
 US6272156
 US2011255563
 US2006159137