Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465157

EP3465157 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR 4-D HYPERSPECTRIAL IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  20.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Verily Life Sciences LLC
269 East Grand Avenue
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SANTORI, Charles
c/o Verily Life Sciences LLC
269 East Grand Avenue
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
02 / SINHA, Supriyo
c/o Verily Life Sciences LLC
269 East Grand Avenue
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
03 / WU, Cheng-Hsun
c/o Verily Life Sciences LLC
269 East Grand Avenue
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
04 / HIGBIE, James
c/o Verily Life Sciences LLC
269 East Grand Avenue
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
05 / LEE, Seung, Ah
c/o Verily Life Sciences LLC
269 East Grand Avenue
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17728979.027.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US34875
Priority number, dateUS201662342252P27.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662342252 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017205857
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465157
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/64, G02B21/00, G02B21/16, G01J3/44, G01J3/18, G01J3/28
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR HYPERSPEKTRALEN 4-D-BILDGEBUNG[2019/15]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR 4-D HYPERSPECTRIAL IMAGING[2019/15]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'IMAGERIE HYPERPSECTRALE 4D[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase01.11.2018National basic fee paid 
01.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
01.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
01.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]EP0916981  (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,11-15,17,19 * paragraphs [0001] , [0026] - [0035] - [0048]; figures 1,5 * [Y] 10,20 [I] 4,5,7-9,16,18;
 [Y]JP2015219501  (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK) [Y] 10,20 * paragraph [0030]; figure 1 *;
 [YA]US2010314554  (GALIMBERTI MASSIMO [IT], et al) [Y] 10,20 * paragraphs [0001] , [0022] - [0032]; figures 2,4,8,12 * [A] 4,5,16;
 [E]US2017176338  (WU CHENG-HSUN [US], et al) [E] 1-20 * paragraphs [0201] - [0340]; figures 11-24 *