Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3465157


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019 Change - extension states published on  04.09.2019  [2019/36]
11.06.2019 Amendment by applicant
03.06.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
08.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
07.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
17.12.2018 Change - representative
17.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
21.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
06.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
31.10.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
29.10.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
27.10.2018 Change - representative
27.10.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
28.09.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
08.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
01.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
20.06.2017 PCT data prior to European publication