EP3464411 - A BLOCKED ISOCYANATE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huntsman International LLC 10003 Woodloch Forest Drive The Woodlands, TX 77380 / US | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOVEL, Craig Gordon 26 Otterington Grove Ivanhoe East, Victoria 3079 / AU | 02 /
MCDAID, Daniel 16/388 Murray Road Preston, Victoria 3072 / AU | 03 /
MCCALLUM, Travis Scott 5 Rubkin Court Hoppers Crossing, Victoria 3029 / AU | 04 /
SHENG, Shan Li 34, No. 20 Alley 3, Lane 6 Shih Chien St. Taipei / TW | 05 /
LIU, Cheng-Dar Rm. 5, 8f No. 142, Sec. 2 Heping W. Rd. Zhongzheng Dist. Taipei City / TW | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Lee, Alexander Mark Huntsman Surface Sciences UK Ltd. Concordia House Glenarm Road, Wynyard Business Park Billingham TS22 5FB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Kourgias, Catherine, et al Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | Application number, filing date | 17728988.1 | 31.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017US35089 | Priority number, date | EP20160172876 | 03.06.2016 Original published format: EP 16172876 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017210234 | Date: | 07.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3464411 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/76, C08G18/80, C08G18/28, C08G18/10 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
C08G18/7664 (EP,RU,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,RU,US);
C08G18/4833 (US);
C08G18/283 (EP,RU,US);
C08G18/2865 (EP,RU,US);
C08G18/48 (RU);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/2865 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | BLOCKIERTE ISOCYANATZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2019/15] | English: | A BLOCKED ISOCYANATE COMPOSITION | [2019/15] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ISOCYANATE BLOQUÉE | [2023/30] |
Former [2019/15] | COMPOSITION D'ISOCYANATE BLOQUÉ | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 03.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/20] | 09.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1068254 (CLARIANT FINANCE BVI LTD [VG]) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035]; examples 1-5; claims 1-4 * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0011] *; | [AD]WO0250152 (BAYER AG [US], et al) [AD] 10* the whole document * | by applicant | EP0234148 | WO0250152 | US6451963 | US6559264 | KR100391247B | US7220814 |