Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469511

EP3469511 - MEMORY MANAGEMENT OF A SECURITY MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Giesecke+Devrient Mobile Security GmbH
Prinzregentenstraße 159
81677 München / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BALDISCHWEILER, Michael
Königsseestr. 50
81825 München / DE
 [2019/16]
Application number, filing date17729009.531.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP00636
Priority number, dateDE2016100713910.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016007139
[2019/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211443
Date:14.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469511
Date:17.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/62, G06F21/79
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:SPEICHERVERWALTUNG EINES SICHERHEITSMODULS[2019/16]
English:MEMORY MANAGEMENT OF A SECURITY MODULE[2019/16]
French:GESTION DE MÉMOIRE D'UN MODULE DE SÉCURITÉ[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
10.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XAI]EP1770534  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,8,10,13 * paragraph [0014]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0026] * [A] 5,11,12,14,15 [I] 3,4,7,9;
 [A]WO2016014919  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * the whole document *