Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472441

EP3472441 - PARTICLE FILTER FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019New entry: Decision on request for further processing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dr.Ing. H.C. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft
Porscheplatz 1
70435 Stuttgart / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / BRINKMEIER, Clemens
Barbara-Kayser-Str. 3
70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE
 [2019/17]
Application number, filing date17729016.007.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP25162
Priority number, dateDE20161011052708.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016110527
[2019/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211468
Date:14.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472441
Date:24.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F01N3/021, F01N3/027, F01N3/023, F01N3/035, F01N3/08
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:PARTIKELFILTER FÜR EINE VERBRENNUNGSKRAFTMASCHINE[2019/17]
English:PARTICLE FILTER FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE[2019/17]
French:FILTRE À PARTICULES POUR MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase04.03.2019National basic fee paid 
04.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
04.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/17]
22.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2019/17]
04.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
04.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
01.04.2019Request for further processing filed
01.04.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.03.2019Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
04.03.2019Request for further processing filed
04.03.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.03.2019Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
04.03.2019Request for further processing filed
04.03.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.03.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP1857647  (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0049] , [ 0054] , [ 0058] , [ 0050] , [0055] , [0066] , [0103] , [0104] * * paragraphs [0100] , [ 0136] * [A] 7,8,10;
 [XAI]DE10135341  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0067] , [0070] - [0074] - [0076] , [0086] , [0096] * [A] 7,8,10 [I] 5,6;
 [AD]EP1250952  (OMG AG & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0031] *
by applicantEP2161420
 EP1250952
 US7691339
 DE102006032886