blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3472441 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3472441



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 136
17.05.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
17.05.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
17.05.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
28.03.2019 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
27.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.03.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
20.03.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
20.03.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
20.03.2019 Request for further processing allowed Search / examination 1
13.03.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.03.2019 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
04.03.2019 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
22.01.2019 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) Search / examination 3
08.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
30.11.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
19.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
03.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
14.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
14.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
14.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 24
18.07.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
18.07.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
18.07.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
29.06.2017 Incoming letter related to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 1
20.06.2017 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 5
07.06.2017 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
07.06.2017 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
07.06.2017 Description PCT receiving Office 16
07.06.2017 Drawings PCT receiving Office 3
07.06.2017 Payment of fees and costs PCT receiving Office 1
07.06.2017 Request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 4