blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3472441


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.08.2019 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
09.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019 Change - extension states published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
22.05.2019 Amendment by applicant
10.04.2019 Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
03.04.2019 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
03.04.2019 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
28.03.2019 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
22.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established
22.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
20.03.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
06.03.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
06.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.03.2019 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
06.03.2019 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
18.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
21.01.2019 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
22.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
16.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
21.06.2017 PCT data prior to European publication