blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3472441 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201780036131 EP17729016



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019153920Global Dossier 23.05.2019A1
Priority number Date
DE102016110527 08.06.2016
WO2017EP25162 07.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20190015480Global Dossier 13.02.2019A
Priority number Date
DE102016110527 08.06.2016
WO2017EP25162 07.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2019523842Global Dossier 29.08.2019A
Priority number Date
DE102016110527 08.06.2016
WO2017EP25162 07.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109312648Global Dossier 05.02.2019A
Priority number Date
DE102016110527 08.06.2016
WO2017EP25162 07.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3472441Global Dossier 24.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
DE102016110527 08.06.2016
WO2017EP25162 07.06.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017211468Global Dossier 14.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
DE102016110527 08.06.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102016110527 14.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
DE102016110527 08.06.2016