Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468730

EP3468730 - LOADING AND UNLOADING DEVICE FOR A MACHINE, MACHINE FOR MACHINING PANEL-LIKE WORKPIECES, AND WORKPIECE SUPPORT FOR SUCH A MACHINE AND METHOD FOR LOADING AND UNLOADING SUCH A MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Trumpf Werkzeugmaschinen GmbH + Co. KG
Johann-Maus-Strasse 2
71254 Ditzingen / DE
For all designated states
J. Schmalz GmbH
Johannes-Schmalz-Strasse 1
72293 Glatten / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DEISS, Magnus
Rippoldsauerstraße 23
70372 Stuttgart / DE
02 / EPPERLEIN, Peter
Seestraße 73
71229 Leonberg / DE
03 / SCHMAUDER, Frank
Uhlandstraße 6
72555 Metzingen / DE
04 / GÄCKLE, Fabian
Hofgartenstraße 13
75382 Althengstett / DE
05 / OTTNAD, Jens
Reinhold-Schneider-Straße 118
76199 Karlsruhe / DE
06 / PROKOP, Heinz-Jürgen
Am Schloss Schellenberg 9
45134 Essen / DE
07 / STRÖBEL, Stefan
Montalinstr.29
7203 Trimmis / CH
08 / DUNKMANN, Walter
Im Eichelgarten 56
76530 Baden-Baden / DE
09 / EISELE, Thomas
Dorfstraße 10
72275 Alpirsbach/Peterzell / DE
10 / HÖHN, Rainer
Im Rank 8
72280 Dornstetten / DE
11 / PLAUELN, Dirk
Eichenweg 21-1
72280 Dornstetten-Hallwangen / DE
12 / REINISCH, Hermann
Sommerberg 55
72172 Sulz a. N./Hopfau / DE
 [2019/24]
Former [2019/16]01 / DEISS, Magnus
Rippoldsauerstraße 23
70372 Stuttgart / DE
02 / EPPERLEIN, Peter
Seestraße 73
71229 Leonberg / DE
03 / SCHMAUDER, Frank
Uhlandstraße 6
72555 Metzingen / DE
04 / GÄCKLE, Fabian
Hofgartenstraße 13
75382 Althengstett / DE
05 / OTTNAD, Jens
Reinhold-Schneider-Straße 118
76199 Karlsruhe / DE
06 / PROKOP, Heinz-Jürgen
Am Schloss Schellenberg 9
45134 Essen / DE
07 / STRÖBEL, Stefan
Nestroyweg 15
70563 Stuttgart / DE
08 / DUNKMANN, Walter
Im Eichelgarten 56
76530 Baden-Baden / DE
09 / EISELE, Thomas
Dorfstraße 10
72275 Alpirsbach/Peterzell / DE
10 / HÖHN, Rainer
Im Rank 8
72280 Dornstetten / DE
11 / PLAUELN, Dirk
Eichenweg 21-1
72280 Dornstetten-Hallwangen / DE
12 / REINISCH, Hermann
Sommerberg 55
72172 Sulz a. N./Hopfau / DE
Representative(s)Mammel und Maser
Patentanwälte Tilsiter Straße 3
71065 Sindelfingen / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17729047.529.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP62928
Priority number, dateDE20161011054208.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016110542
[2019/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211611
Date:14.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468730
Date:17.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B21D28/00, B21D43/02, B21D43/18, B23K37/04, B23Q7/04
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:BE- UND ENTLADEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE MASCHINE, MASCHINE ZUM BEARBEITEN VON PLATTENFÖRMIGEN WERKSTÜCKEN SOWIE WERKSTÜCKAUFLAGE FÜR EINE SOLCHE MASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUM BE- UND ENTLADEN EINER SOLCHEN MASCHINE[2019/16]
English:LOADING AND UNLOADING DEVICE FOR A MACHINE, MACHINE FOR MACHINING PANEL-LIKE WORKPIECES, AND WORKPIECE SUPPORT FOR SUCH A MACHINE AND METHOD FOR LOADING AND UNLOADING SUCH A MACHINE[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF DE CHARGEMENT ET DE DÉCHARGEMENT POUR UNE MACHINE, MACHINE D'USINAGE DE PIÈCES EN FORME DE PLAQUES, PORTE-PIÈCES POUR UNE TELLE MACHINE ET PROCÉDÉ DE CHARGEMENT ET DE DÉCHARGEMENT D'UNE TELLE MACHINE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
08.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
31.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO9614965  (SAPIM AMADA SPA [IT], et al) [X] 18 * page 7; figures 1,3 * [I] 19-24;
 [AD]DE102015207122  (TRUMPF WERKZEUGMASCHINEN GMBH + CO KG [DE]) [AD] 26 * paragraphs [0030] , [0036]; figure - *;
 [AD]DE102014209811  (SCHMALZ J GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-26 * figure - *;
 [A]JPH04187333  (AMADA CO LTD) [A] 1-26 * abstract *
by applicantDE102015207122
 DE102013226818
 US2003147729
 DE102014209811