Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469725

EP3469725 - BEAM MANGEMENT SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.12.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / NILSSON, Andreas
Seminariegatan 16
SE-41313 G teborg / SE
02 / ATHLEY, Fredrik
Banvallen 65A
SE-42930 Kullavik / SE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Ericsson
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17729079.805.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP63603
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018224119
Date:13.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469725
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2018
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.12.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/0452, H04B7/08
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STRAHLVERWALTUNGSSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN[2019/16]
English:BEAM MANGEMENT SYSTEMS AND METHODS[2019/16]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE GESTION DE FAISCEAU[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
10.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.03.2019Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]US2016337879  (HWANG CHIEN-HWA [TW], et al) [I] 1-28 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0070] * * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US2015282122  (KIM YONG-SEOK [KR]) [A] 1-28 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0103] * * figures 1-7, 9, 10 *;
 [A]US2015282001  (KWAK SE-MIN [KR], et al) [A] 1-28 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0093] * * figures 1A, 2, 5, 6, 17 *