Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464960

EP3464960 - PISTON DEVICE AND PUMP DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.12.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
13.12.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ElringKlinger AG
Max-Eyth-Strasse 2
72581 Dettingen / DE
For all designated states
Elringklinger Kunststofftechnik GmbH
Etzelstrasse 10
74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / KLEIN, Patrick
Rohrer Strasse 180
70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
02 / HOCKER, Klaus
Enzstrasse 22
74379 Ingersheim / DE
03 / KOPP, Fabian
Hauptstrasse 85
71732 Tamm / DE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17729084.806.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP63671
Priority number, dateDE20161020993006.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016209930
[2019/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211795
Date:14.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464960
Date:10.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F16J15/00, F02M59/44, F16J15/32, F16J15/56
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:KOLBENVORRICHTUNG UND PUMPENVORRICHTUNG[2019/15]
English:PISTON DEVICE AND PUMP DEVICE[2019/15]
French:ENSEMBLE PISTON ET ENSEMBLE POMPE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase15.11.2018National basic fee paid 
15.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
15.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
15.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.12.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]DE9107284U  (BEB ERDGAS UND ERDÖL GMBH) [X] 1-5,7-14 * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 16; figures 1, 2 * [Y] 6 [I] 15;
 [X]WO2013076146  (MAGENWIRTH GMBH & CO KG GUSTAV [DE]) [X] 1-5,7 * page 12, line 29 - page 19, line 18; figures 1, 2, 10 *;
 [X]DE10026360  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027]; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US3738665  (BILCO A) [Y] 6 * column 2, line 52 - line 53; figure 2a *
by applicantEP2047148
 DE102014218992
 DE102012217260
 DE102013204365
 DE19522306
 EP1284367