Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468619

EP3468619 - RADIO-PHARMACEUTICAL COMPLEXES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer Pharma Aktiengesellschaft
Müllerstrasse 178
13353 Berlin / DE
For all designated states
Bayer AS
Drammensveien 288
0283 Oslo / NO
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / CUTHBERTSON, Alan
Orreveien 14
0789 Oslo / NO
02 / TRAUTWEIN, Mark
Narzissenweg 4
42489 Wülfrath / DE
03 / WEBER, Ernst
Hermann-Köhl-Straße 1
40764 Langenfeld / DE
04 / KARLSSON, Jenny
Ullevalsveien 56C
0454 Oslo / NO
05 / HAMMER, Stefanie
Neue Welt 12
10247 Berlin / DE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)BIP Patents
c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10
40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17729086.306.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP63689
Priority number, dateEP2016017387410.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16173874
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211809
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468619
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K51/04, A61K51/10, C07D213/81, A61P35/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBA10.01.2019
ME10.01.2019
Validation statesMA10.01.2019
TitleGerman:RADIOPHARMAZEUTISCHE KOMPLEXE[2019/16]
English:RADIO-PHARMACEUTICAL COMPLEXES[2019/16]
French:COMPLEXES RADIOPHARMACEUTIQUES[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
10.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XPI]WO2016096843  (BAYER AS [NO]) [XP] 1-17 * example 3 b) on page 55 * [I] 1-17;
 [YD]WO2013167754  (ALGETA ASA [NO]) [YD] 1-17 * example 8 on page 47 *;
 [YD]WO2011098611  (ALGETA AS [NO], et al) [YD] 1-17 * example 2 on page 30 * * example 8 on page 44 *
by applicantWO0160417
 WO0205859
 WO2004091668
 WO2011098611
 WO2013167754
 WO2013167755
 WO2013167756
 WO2011040972
 US4880615
 US5624901
 WO2008063721
 US4816397
 US5168062
 US4510245
 US4968615
 US4399216
 US4634665
 US5179017
    - FEINENDEGEN et al., Radiat Res, (19970000), vol. 148, pages 195 - 201
    - WILBUR, Antibody Immunocon Radiopharm, (19910000), vol. 4, pages 85 - 96
    - BANKS PR; PAQUETTE DM., Bioconjug Chem, (19950000), vol. 6, pages 447 - 458
    - DUBEY I; PRATVIEL G, Meunier BJournal: Bioconjug Chem, (19980000), vol. 9, pages 627 - 632
    - BIRD et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426
    - HUSTON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883
    - MCCAFFERTY et al., Nature, (19900000), vol. 348, pages 552 - 554
    - GOEDDEL, Gene Expression Technology. Methods in Enzymology, Academic Press, (19900000), vol. 185
    - BEBBINGTON et al., Biotechnology (N Y, (19920200), vol. 10, no. 2, pages 169 - 75
    - URLAUB; CHASIN, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19800000), vol. 77, pages 4216 - 4220
    - URLAUB et al., Cell, (19830600), vol. 33, no. 2, pages 405 - 12
    - R. J. KAUFMAN; P. A. SHARP, Mol. Biol., (19820000), vol. 159, pages 601 - 621
    - FAN et al., Biotechnol Bioeng., (20120400), vol. 109, no. 4, pages 1007 - 15
    - DUROCHER et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20020115), vol. 30, no. 2, page E9
    - COLLIGAN, Current Protocols in Immunology
    - LARSEN, J Nucl Med, (20020000), vol. 43, no. 5, page 160P
    - MULLER, Int. J. Radiat. Biol., (19710000), vol. 20, pages 233 - 243
    - HRISTODOROV et al., Mol Biotechnol, (20130000), vol. 53, pages 326 - 335