Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469197

EP3469197 - METHOD FOR DETECTING A LEAK IN A FEED LINE OF LIQUID SYSTEM IN A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Plastic Omnium Advanced Innovation and Research
Rue de la Fusée, 98-100
1130 Bruxelles / BE
[2019/35]
Former [2019/16]For all designated states
Plastic Omnium Advanced Innovation and Research
Rue de Ransbeek, 310
1120 Bruxelles / BE
Inventor(s)01 / DEDEURWAERDER, Jürgen
Neerzellikstraat 10
1731 Relegem / BE
02 / VERSPECHT, Jonathan
avenue d'Uccle 44/2
1190 Forest / BE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)LLR
11, boulevard de Sébastopol
75001 Paris / FR
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17729110.109.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP64075
Priority number, dateWO2016EP6321809.06.2016         Original published format: PCT/EP2016/063218
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212015
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469197
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F01N11/00, F02M65/00, F02M37/08, F02D33/00, B60K15/00, G01M3/28, G01M3/02
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG EINES LECKS IN EINER VERSORGUNGSLEITUNG EINES FLÜSSIGKEITSSYSTEMS IN EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUG[2019/16]
English:METHOD FOR DETECTING A LEAK IN A FEED LINE OF LIQUID SYSTEM IN A MOTOR VEHICLE[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ SERVANT À DÉTECTER UNE FUITE DANS UNE LIGNE D'ALIMENTATION DE SYSTÈME DE LIQUIDE DANS UN VÉHICULE À MOTEUR[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase03.01.2019National basic fee paid 
03.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
03.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]DE102015112921  (CUMMINS EMISSION SOLUTIONS INC [US]) [A] 1-7,10-12 * paragraphs [0022] , [0047] - [0054]; figures 1-3 *;
 [AD]DE102009029408  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [AD] 1-4,6-10,12 * paragraphs [0008] - [0011]; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE102013218553  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,6-12 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0025] - [0037]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE102013105710  (EMITEC GES FÜR EMISSIONSTECHNOLOGIE MBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,6-12 * paragraphs [0007] - [0042] - [0049] - [0052]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2010082224  (STRETCH DALE ARDEN [US]) [A] 1,4,10,12 * paragraphs [0037] - [0043]; figures 1,4,6 *;
 [A]US2006016253  (KOBAYASHI MITSUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,11,12 * abstract *
by applicantDE102009029408