Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469097

EP3469097 - METHOD FOR THE SEPARATION OF A MODIFIED POLYNUCLEOTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2019/16]POLYNUCLEOTIDE SEPARATION METHOD
[2019/48]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.01.2020
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020(Expected) grantpublished on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Base4 Innovation Limited
Broers Building
JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB3 0FA / GB
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DEAR, Paul
c/o Base4 Innovation Limited
Broers Building
JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0FA / GB
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Lau, Sarah Jane
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2020/08]
Former [2019/16]Briscoe, Paul Brian , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
Application number, filing date17729151.514.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP64509
Priority number, dateEP2016017445514.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16174455
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216211
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469097
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3469097
Date:19.02.2020
Language:EN
[2020/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/6834, C12N15/10
[2019/47]
Former International [2019/16]C12Q1/68, C12N15/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ABTRENNUNG EINES MODIFIZIERTEN POLYNUKLEOTIDS[2019/48]
English:METHOD FOR THE SEPARATION OF A MODIFIED POLYNUCLEOTIDE[2019/48]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION D'UN POLYNUCLÉOTIDE MODIFIÉ[2019/48]
Former [2019/16]POLYNUKLEOTIDTRENNVERFAHREN
Former [2019/16]POLYNUCLEOTIDE SEPARATION METHOD
Former [2019/16]PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION DE POLYNUCLÉOTIDES
Entry into regional phase11.01.2019National basic fee paid 
11.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
11.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
04.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.01.2020Fee for grant paid
06.01.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.01.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YD]WO0127328  (UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US], et al) [YD] 1-13 * figure 1; claims 1-19 *;
 [YD]US2014335528  (OLEJNIK JERZY [US], et al) [YD] 1-13 * pages 2-5; figure 3; examples 2,3; claims 1-39 *;
 [YD]EP2196544  (APPLIED BIOSYSTEMS LLC [US]) [YD] 1-13 * paragraphs [0092] - [0095] - [0130] - [0131]; figure 28 *;
 [Y]WO2005003375  (454 CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * pages 16-22; figures 1G,4,7; examples 1,9,14,18 *;
 [A]US2010311602  (LEVY SAMUEL [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figure 1; claims 11,12 *;
 [A]US2013122485  (HONG HYO BONG [KR]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1,2,4 *
by applicantWO0127328
 US2014335528
 EP2196544
    - J. Nanotechnol., (20160000), vol. 7, pages 138 - 148