Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465982

EP3465982 - BIDIRECTIONAL MULTICASTING OVER VIRTUAL PORT CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cisco Technology, Inc.
170 West Tasman Drive
San Jose, CA 95134 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / BACHTU, Nataraj
Cisco Technology Inc.
170 West Tasman Drive
San Jose, CA 95134 / US
02 / SIVARAMU, Raghava
Cisco Technology Inc.
170 West Tasman Drive
San Jose, CA 95134 / US
03 / RAMABADRAN, Srinivasan
Cisco Technology Inc.
170 West Tasman Drive
San Jose, CA 95134 / US
04 / TANG, Terry, Fengcheng
Cisco Technology Inc.
170 West Tasman Drive
San Jose, CA 95134 / US
05 / DONTUBOYINA, Lenin, Babu
Cisco Technology Inc.
170 West Tasman Drive
San Jose, CA 95134 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Kazi, Ilya , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17729261.223.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US33909
Priority number, dateUS201662343737P31.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662343737 P
US20161521665121.07.2016         Original published format: US201615216651
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210013
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465982
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/18, H04L12/761
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:BIDIREKTIONALES MULTICASTING ÜBER KANAL MIT VIRTUELLEM PORT[2019/15]
English:BIDIRECTIONAL MULTICASTING OVER VIRTUAL PORT CHANNEL[2019/15]
French:MULTI-DIFFUSION BIDIRECTIONNELLE SUR CANAL DE PORT VIRTUEL[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase13.11.2018National basic fee paid 
13.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
13.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2016081659  (CISCO TECH INC [US]) [Y] 1-23 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 21] , [0 22] , [0 67] - [0069] - [0 73] , [0 74]; figures 5a, 6a *;
 [Y]US2011211578  (ZWIEBEL JOHN M [US], et al) [Y] 1-23 * paragraph [0004] *;
 [A]US2008298360  (WIJNANDS JACOB IJSBRAND [BE], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0025] - [0027] *