Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465527

EP3465527 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF EFFICIENT AND SECURE DATA FILTERING OF NON-PERMITTED DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Atomite, Inc.
360 Ponfield Pl.
Ridgewood, New Jersey 07450 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / FISSE, Jon Lyndon
360 Ponfield Pl.
Ridgewood New Jersey 07450 / US
02 / GOLDBAUM, Stephen Scott
95 Argyle Road
Brooklyn New York 11218 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17729287.725.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US34562
Priority number, dateUS201662341286P25.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662341286 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017205683
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465527
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/62, H04L29/06
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR EFFIZIENTEN UND SICHEREN DATENFILTRIERUNG VON UNZULÄSSIGEN DATEN[2019/15]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD OF EFFICIENT AND SECURE DATA FILTERING OF NON-PERMITTED DATA[2019/15]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE FILTRAGE DE DONNÉES EFFICACE ET SÉCURISÉ DE DONNÉES NON AUTORISÉES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2018National basic fee paid 
18.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
18.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2011137946  (SIRESS ANTHONY [US] ET AL) [X] 1,15,23 * paragraphs [0017] - [0081] - [0086] - [0088] - [0116] - [0120]; figures 1,4 * [Y] 2-14,16-22,24-30;
 [YA]US2013124628  (WEERASINGHE SRILAL [US]) [Y] 2-14,16-22,24-30 * paragraphs [0020] - [0024] - [0035] - [0040] * [A] 1,15,23;
 [A]US2010199098  (KING SIMON P [US]) [A] 1-30 * paragraphs [0005] - [0024] - [0047] - [0059]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2006242685  (HEARD ROBERT W [US] ET AL) [A] 1-30 * paragraphs [0027] - [0034] - [0071] - [0075]; figures 1,10 *