EP3462966 - FOOTWEAR MANUFACTURING WITH A NESTED FLAT PATTERN UPPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nike Innovate C.V. Dutch Partnership One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KILGORE, Bruce J. c/o NIKE, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2022/44] |
Former [2019/15] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17729329.7 | 01.06.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017US35451 | Priority number, date | US201662344365P | 01.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662344365 P | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017210429 | Date: | 07.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3462966 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3462966 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A43B23/04, A43D8/02, A43D8/10, A43D8/26, A43D8/28, A43D8/30 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
A43B23/042 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A43D11/12 (CN,KR,US);
A43D8/26 (EP,CN,US);
A43B23/0245 (CN,KR,US);
A43D8/02 (EP,CN,US);
A43D8/10 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A43D8/28 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A43D8/30 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A43B23/0205 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUHWERKSHERSTELLUNG MIT VERSCHACHTELTEM OBERSCHUH MIT FLACHEM MUSTER | [2019/15] | English: | FOOTWEAR MANUFACTURING WITH A NESTED FLAT PATTERN UPPER | [2019/15] | French: | FABRICATION DE CHAUSSURES À TIGE IMBRIQUÉE À MOTIF PLAT | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 16.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22197510.5 / EP4129107 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.11.2022 | AT | 02.11.2022 | CZ | 02.11.2022 | DK | 02.11.2022 | EE | 02.11.2022 | ES | 02.11.2022 | FI | 02.11.2022 | HR | 02.11.2022 | LT | 02.11.2022 | LV | 02.11.2022 | MC | 02.11.2022 | NL | 02.11.2022 | PL | 02.11.2022 | RO | 02.11.2022 | RS | 02.11.2022 | SE | 02.11.2022 | SI | 02.11.2022 | SK | 02.11.2022 | SM | 02.11.2022 | NO | 02.02.2023 | GR | 03.02.2023 | IS | 02.03.2023 | PT | 02.03.2023 | IE | 01.06.2023 | LU | 01.06.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/15] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
LU | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 02.11.2022 | |
NO | 02.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [IA]FR680559 (BESSAUD JEAN) [I] 1 * pag.1, col.2, l.34-60; pag.2, col1,l.15;; figures 1,3 * [A] 2-25; | [XI]US2471366 (ERMINIO CASSANO) [X] 1 * column 1, line 56 - column 4, line 24; figure 1 * [I] 2-25; | [A]AT341373B (WOLFVERINE WORLD WIDE INC [US]) [A] 1-25* the whole document *; | [IA]CA2000090 (RBFPT INC [US]) [I] 1 * detailed description of fig.3,9,16,25;; figures 3,9,16,25 * [A] 2-25; | [A]FR2853819 (MARQUET ET CIE [FR]) [A] 1-25 * page 1, line 9; figure 1 * |