Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463802

EP3463802 - STRETCH-BLOW-MOULDED PLASTIC CONTAINER WITH AN INTEGRATED GRIP REGION, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE PLASTIC CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  22.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alpla-Werke Alwin Lehner GmbH und Co. KG
Allmendstrasse 81
6971 Hard / AT
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / DEMIR, Adem
Karl Höll Strasse 12b
6923 Lauterach / AT
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Bohest AG Branch Ostschweiz
Postfach
9471 Buchs / CH
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17729373.515.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP61602
Priority number, dateCH2016000072106.06.2016         Original published format: CH 7212016
[2019/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211540
Date:14.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463802
Date:10.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B29C49/48
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:STRECKGEBLASENER KUNSTSTOFFBEHÄLTER MIT EINEM INTEGRIERT AUSGEBILDETEN GRIFFBEREICH UND HERSTELLVERFAHREN FÜR DEN KUNSTSTOFFBEHÄLTER[2019/15]
English:STRETCH-BLOW-MOULDED PLASTIC CONTAINER WITH AN INTEGRATED GRIP REGION, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE PLASTIC CONTAINER[2019/15]
French:RÉCIPIENT SOUFFLÉ-ÉTIRÉ EN MATÉRIAU SYNTHÉTIQUE PRÉSENTANT UNE ZONE DE PRÉHENSION RÉALISÉE D'UN SEUL TENANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DU RÉCIPIENT EN MATÉRIAU SYNTHÉTIQUE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase14.11.2018National basic fee paid 
14.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
14.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
14.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP1688234  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0005] , [0011] , [0024] * [Y] 4,11;
 [XYI]EP1853416  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 6] , [00 8] , [0 10] - [0013] - [0 18] , [0 29] , [0 31] , [0 32] , [0 34]; figures 1-2 * [Y] 3,4,11-15,17,18 [I] 6,16;
 [XY]US2004245678  (BELCHER SAMUEL L [US]) [X] 1,2,5-8 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 9] , [0 11] , [0 13] , [0016] - [0017] - [0 45] , [0 46] , [0055] * [Y] 3,4,17,18;
 [Y]  - Anonymous, "Klar-Klar-Schweißen ohne Additive - Plastverarbeiter.de", (20150622), URL: http://www.plastverarbeiter.de/52063/klar-klar-schweissen-ohne-additive/, (20160914), XP055302695 [Y] 3,4,12-15 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - Rolf Klein, "Laserstrahlschweißen transparenter und farbiger Kunststoffe", (20070901), pages 41 - 44, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/10.1002/latj.200790176/pdf, (20160914), XP055302696 [Y] 3,4,12-15 * the whole document *