Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463862

EP3463862 - LAMINATE FOR DIMENSIONALLY STABLE FOODSTUFF CONTAINERS HAVING AN OUTER POLYMER LAYER WITH A REFLECTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  22.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIG Technology AG
Laufengasse 18
8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHIBULL, Dirk
Friedhofstrasse 12
41836 Hückelhoven Baal / DE
02 / PAULING, Alexander
Waat 271
41363 Jüchen / DE
03 / JOEKEN, Sven
Am Steinberg 79
52353 Düren / DE
04 / ESSER, Daniel
Birkenstraße 17
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Herzog IP Patentanwalts GmbH
Immermannstraße 40
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Immermannstrasse 40
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date17729407.123.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP62449
Priority number, dateDE20161020943431.05.2016         Original published format: DE102016209434
DE20171020592806.04.2017         Original published format: DE102017205928
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017207367
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463862
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B32B7/12, B32B15/085, B32B15/12, B32B27/08, B32B27/30, B32B27/32, B32B27/34, B32B29/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:LAMINAT FÜR FORMSTABILE LEBENSMITTELBEHÄLTER MIT EINER ÄUSSEREN POLYMERSCHICHT MIT REFLEXIONSVERMÖGEN[2019/15]
English:LAMINATE FOR DIMENSIONALLY STABLE FOODSTUFF CONTAINERS HAVING AN OUTER POLYMER LAYER WITH A REFLECTANCE[2019/15]
French:STRATIFIÉ POUR CONTENANTS DE PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES À STABILITÉ DIMENSIONNELLE, COMPORTANT UNE COUCHE POLYMÈRE EXTERNE À RÉFLECTANCE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2018National basic fee paid 
18.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
18.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]US2014312103  (WOLTERS MICHAEL [DE]) [I] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0066] *;
 [I]WO2016066592  (SIG TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [I] 1-16 * abstract * * pages 14,18,19 *;
 [I]WO2016005241  (SIG TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [I] 1-16 * abstract * * pages 14,15 *;
 [A]US2012100320  (TOFT NILS [SE], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0105] - [0109] *;
 [A]DE19822646  (BAYERISCHE MAS IND ARNO KELLER [DE]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *
by applicantWO9009926
 EP1089877
 EP1089877
 EP1812298
    - WILLY HERBST; KLAUS HUNGER, Industrial Organic Pigments, Third Edition, WILEY-VCH VERLAG GMBH & CO. KGAA, (2004), ISBN 3-527-30576-9