Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472147

EP3472147 - AZABENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES AS PI3K BETA INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  22.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Janssen Pharmaceutica NV
Turnhoutseweg 30
2340 Beerse / BE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / PILATTE, Isabelle, Noëlle, Constance
Janssen-Cilag
1 Rue Camille Desmoulins
TSA 91003
92787 Issy-les Moulineaux Cedex 9 / FR
02 / QUEROLLE, Olivier, Alexis, Georges
Janssen-Cilag
1 Rue Camille Desmoulins
TSA 91003
92787 Issy-les Moulineaux Cedex 9 / FR
03 / ANGIBAUD, Patrick, René
Janssen-Cilag
1 Rue Camille Desmoulins
TSA 91003
92787 Issy-les Moulineaux Cedex 9 / FR
04 / BERTHELOT, Didier, Jean-Claude
Janssen-Cilag
1 Rue Camille Desmoulins
TSA 91003
92787 Issy-les Moulineaux Cedex 9 / FR
05 / COUPA, Sophie
Janssen-Cilag
1 Rue Camille Desmoulins
TSA 91003
92787 Issy-les Moulineaux Cedex 9 / FR
06 / DEMESTRE, Christophe, Gabriel, Marcel
Janssen-Cilag
1 Rue Camille Desmoulins
TSA 91003
92787 Issy-les Moulineaux Cedex 9 / FR
07 / MEERPOEL, Lieven
Janssen Pharmaceutica NV
Turnhoutseweg 30
2340 Beerse / BE
08 / MERCEY, Guillaume, Jean, Maurice
Janssen-Cilag
1 Rue Camille Desmoulins
TSA 91003
92787 Issy-les Moulineaux Cedex 9 / FR
09 / MEVELLEC, Laurence, Anne
Janssen-Cilag
1 Rue Camille Desmoulins
TSA 91003
92787 Issy-les Moulineaux Cedex 9 / FR
10 / MEYER, Christophe
Janssen-Cilag
1 Rue Camille Desmoulins
TSA 91003
92787 Issy-les Moulineaux Cedex 9 / FR
11 / PASQUIER, Elisabeth, Thérèse, Jeanne
Janssen-Cilag
1 Rue Camille Desmoulins
TSA 91003
92787 Issy-les Moulineaux Cedex 9 / FR
12 / PONCELET, Virginie, Sophie
Janssen-Cilag
1 Rue Camille Desmoulins
TSA 91003
92787 Issy-les Moulineaux Cedex 9 / FR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Lenaerts, Philip
Johnson & Johnson Patent Law Department
Turnhoutseweg 30
2340 Beerse / BE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17729500.315.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP64672
Priority number, dateEP2016017471216.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16174712
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216293
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472147
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07D401/04, A61K31/496, A61P35/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBA16.01.2019
ME16.01.2019
Validation statesMA16.01.2019
MD16.01.2019
TitleGerman:AZABENZIMIDALZOLDERIVATE ALS PI3K-BETA-INHIBITOREN[2019/17]
English:AZABENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES AS PI3K BETA INHIBITORS[2019/17]
French:DÉRIVÉS D'AZABENZIMIDAZOLE UTILISÉS COMME INHIBITEURS DE PI3K BÊTA[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase16.01.2019National basic fee paid 
16.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
16.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
16.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO2009045175  (S BIO PTE LTD [SG], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 1, line 4 - page 9, line 14; claim - *;
 [AD]WO2013095761  (GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 1, line 5 - page 3, line 3; claim - *
 [A]  - EUNA YOO ET AL, "Structure-activity relationships in Toll-like receptor 7 agonistic 1H-imidazo[4,5-c]pyridines", ORGANIC & BIOMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY, (20130815), vol. 11, no. 38, doi:10.1039/c3ob40816g, ISSN 1477-0520, page 6526, XP055165875 [A] 1-15 * introduction;; compounds 22e,23e *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3ob40816g
by applicantWO2012116237
 WO2011123751
 WO2011022439
 WO2008014219
 WO2013028263
 WO2012047538
 WO2013095761
 US2013157977
 WO2009021083
 WO2007103756
 WO2011041399
 WO2009088990
    - K.D COURTNEY; R.B. CORCORAN; J.A. ENGELMAN, Journal of Clinical Oncology., (20100000), vol. 28, page 1075
    - B. VANHAESEBROECK; M.D. WATERFIELD, Experimental Cell Research., (19990000), vol. 253, pages 239 - 254
    - ZHAO L.; VOGT P. K., Oncogene, (20080000), vol. 27, pages 5486 - 5496
    - MYERS M. P.; PASS I.; BATTY I. H.; VAN DER KAAY J.; STOLAROV J. P.; HEMMINGS B. A.; WIGLER M. H.; DOWNES C. P.; TONKS N. K, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19980000), vol. 95, pages 13513 - 13518
    - STOKOE D.; STEPHENS L. R.; COPELAND T.; GAFFNEY P. R.; REESE C. B.; PAINTER G. F.; HOLMES A. B.; MCCORMICK F.; HAWKINS P. T., Science, (19970000), vol. 277, pages 567 - 570
    - D. R. CALNAN; A. BRUNET, Oncogene, (20080000), vol. 27, page 2276
    - JIA S; LIU Z; ZHANG S; LIU P; ZHANG L; LEE SH; ZHANG J; SIGNORETTI S; LODA M; ROBERTS TM, Nature, (20080000), vol. 454, pages 776 - 9
    - WEE S; WIEDERSCHAIN D; MAIRA SM; LOO A; MILLER C; DEBEAUMONT R; STEGMEIER F; YAO YM; LENGAUER C, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci (USA), (20080000), vol. 105, page 13057
    - S. P. JACKSON et al., Nature Medicine., (20050000), vol. 11, pages 507 - 514
    - MARQUES RB et al., "High Efficacy of Combination Therapy Using PI3K/AKT Inhibitors with Androgen Deprivation in Prostate Cancer Preclinical Models", Eur Urol, (20140000), URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.eururo.2014.08.053