Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465011

EP3465011 - ANNULAR COMBUSTION CHAMBER WITH CONTINUOUS DETONATION WAVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  22.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Safran
2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / LEYKO, Matthieu
c/o SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES PI (AJI)
Rond-point René Ravaud-Réau
77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL CEDEX / FR
02 / CAZALENS, Michel, Pierre
c/o SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES PI (AJI)
Rond-point René Ravaud-Réau
77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL CEDEX / FR
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17729523.522.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017FR51252
Priority number, dateFR2016005457023.05.2016         Original published format: FR 1654570
[2019/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017203145
Date:30.11.2017
Language:FR
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465011
Date:10.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:F23R7/00, F02K7/04
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:RINGBRENNKAMMER MIT KONTINUIERLICHER DETONATIONSWELLE[2019/15]
English:ANNULAR COMBUSTION CHAMBER WITH CONTINUOUS DETONATION WAVE[2019/15]
French:CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION ANNULAIRE A ONDE DE DÉTONATION CONTINUE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase21.11.2018National basic fee paid 
21.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
21.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
21.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[AD]EP2480771  (PRATT & WHITNEY ROCKETDYNE INC [US]) [AD] 1,3,9,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0010] , [0013]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2009158748  (NORDEEN CRAIG A [US]) [A] 1,9,10 * paragraphs [0033] - [0035] - [0047]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO2014129920  (NONPROFIT PARTNERSHIP IN SCEINCE EDUCATION AND INNOVATION ACTIVITIES C) [A] 1-4,9,10 * abstract *;
 [A]  - WANG F ET AL, "Transient plasma ignituion of hydrocarbon-air mixtures in pulse detonation engines", AIAA AEROSPACE SCIENCES MEETING / AIAA THERMOPHYSICS CONFERENCE, XX, XX, (20040101), no. Paper 2004-0834, pages 1 - 8, XP009138055 [A] 1,10 * page 6, column 2, line 24 - line 44 *
by applicantEP2480771
 US2012151898