Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465477

EP3465477 - CACHED DATA EXPIRATION AND REFRESH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  22.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Home Box Office, Inc.
1100 Avenue of The Americas
New York, NY 10036 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / LUTZ, Jonathan David
c/o Home Box Office Inc.
1100 Avenue of the Americas
New York, New York 10036 / US
02 / BUSAYARAT, Sata
c/o Home Box Office Inc.
1100 Avenue of the Americas
New York, New York 10036 / US
03 / QI, Mei
c/o Home Box Office Inc.
1100 Avenue of the Americas
New York, New York 10036 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17729629.026.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US34751
Priority number, dateUS20161517066801.06.2016         Original published format: US201615170668
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210123
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465477
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, G06F12/123, H04L29/08
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:ABLAUF UND AKTUALISIERUNG VON ZWISCHENGESPEICHERTEN DATEN[2019/15]
English:CACHED DATA EXPIRATION AND REFRESH[2019/15]
French:EXPIRATION ET RAFRAÎCHISSEMENT DE DONNÉES MISES EN ANTÉMÉMOIRE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase27.12.2018National basic fee paid 
27.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
27.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2014067913  (VON HADEN KYLE MATTHEW [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,9-11,14,15,18-20 * figures 1-8G * * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] - [0018] , [0020] - [0093] * [I] 4-8,12,13,16,17;
 [A]US6618751  (CHALLENGER JAMES ROBERT HAROLD [US] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * figures 1A-9B * * column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 31 * * column 3, line 3 - column 11, line 12 *;
 [A]US2016026568  (MARSHALL BRADLEY EUGENE [US] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * figures 2-7B * * paragraphs [0002] - [0007] - [0017] - [0067] *;
 [A]US2008281798  (CHATTERJEE MANJIRNATH [US] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * figures 1,6-8 * * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0012] - [0049] *