Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465962

EP3465962 - ENCODING AND DECODING OF CONTROL SIGNALING WITH SECTIONAL REDUNDANCY CHECK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  22.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / LIN, Jamie Menjay
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / YANG, Yang
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / SORIAGA, Joseph Binamira
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17729655.530.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US35026
Priority number, dateUS201662346291P06.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662346291 P
US20171560716126.05.2017         Original published format: US201715607161
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210205
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465962
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/00, H03M13/13, H03M13/09
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:CODIERUNG UND DECODIERUNG VON STEUERSIGNALISIERUNG MIT SEKTIONALER REDUNDANZPRÜFUNG[2019/15]
English:ENCODING AND DECODING OF CONTROL SIGNALING WITH SECTIONAL REDUNDANCY CHECK[2019/15]
French:CODAGE ET DÉCODAGE DE SIGNALISATION DE COMMANDE AVEC CONTRÔLE DE REDONDANCE SECTIONNELLE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase15.11.2018National basic fee paid 
15.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
15.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
15.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]CN105227189  (UNIV ELECTRONIC SCIENCE & TECH) [I] 1,9,20,25,31,32 * the whole document *;
 [I]US2014304574  (SEO DONGYOUN [KR], et al) [I] 1,9,20,25,31,32 * figures 1, 2, 3 * * paragraph [0011] *;
 [I]US2002147954  (SHEA JOHN M [US]) [I] 1-5,9-13,20-27,31,32 * figures 3, 4, 5 * * paragraph [0045] *
 [I]  - GUO JIANFENG ET AL, "Multi-CRC Polar Codes and Their Applications", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, vol. 20, no. 2, doi:10.1109/LCOMM.2015.2508022, ISSN 1089-7798, (20160201), pages 212 - 215, (20160208), XP011598246 [I] 1-3,6,7,9-11,14-22,25,26,28-32 * sections III and IV-A *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LCOMM.2015.2508022
 [I]  - ZHOU HUAYI ET AL, "Segmented CRC-Aided SC List Polar Decoding", 2016 IEEE 83RD VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE (VTC SPRING), IEEE, (20160515), doi:10.1109/VTCSPRING.2016.7504469, pages 1 - 5, XP032918751 [I] 1-3,6,7,9-11,14-22,25,26,28-32 * section III *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VTCSpring.2016.7504469
 [I]  - BRIAN CHEN ET AL, "List Viterbi Algorithms for Continuous Transmission", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ. USA, (20010501), vol. 49, no. 5, ISSN 0090-6778, XP011009921 [I] 1-3,6,7,9-11,14,16-22,25,26,29-32 * figures 1, 2 * * section II *
 [A]  - ERICSSON, "Performance and Complexity of Per-Segment CRC Attachment Methods", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-073741, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070815), vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20070815, XP050107330 [A] 1,9,20,25,31,32 * the whole document *