Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465506

EP3465506 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR DESIGNING GENE PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  22.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Life Technologies Corporation
Legal Department IP Docketing
5823 Newton Drive
Carlsbad, California 92008 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / WILLIAMS, Emily
Life Technologies Corporation
Legal Department
IP Docketing
5823 Newton Drive
Carlsbad California 92008 / US
02 / TIAN, Yuan
Life Technologies Corporation
Legal Department
IP Docketing
5823 Newton Drive
Carlsbad California 92008 / US
03 / ZHU, Yun
Life Technologies Corporation
Legal Department
IP Docketing
5823 Newton Drive
Carlsbad California 92008 / US
04 / SHTIR, Corina
Life Technologies Corporation
Legal Department
IP Docketing
5823 Newton Drive
Carlsbad California 92008 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Ziermann, Oliver
Life Technolgies GmbH
Frankfurter Straße 129b
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17729697.701.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US35466
Priority number, dateUS201662344078P01.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662344078 P
US201662395828P16.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662395828 P
US201762509860P23.05.2017         Original published format: US 201762509860 P
US201762510906P25.05.2017         Original published format: US 201762510906 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210437
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465506
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/28, G06F19/18
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUM ENTWERFEN VON GENPANELS[2019/15]
English:METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR DESIGNING GENE PANELS[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DESTINÉS À LA CONCEPTION DE PANNEAU GÉNÉTIQUE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2018National basic fee paid 
19.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
19.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2011151500  (HELSINGIN YLIOPISTO [FI], et al) [I] 1-20 * abstract *;
 [I]WO2014037914  (UNIV THE WESTERN CAPE [ZA]) [I] 1-20 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2015051275  (PERSONALIS INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5210015
 US5399491
 US4683202
 US4683195
 US4965188
 US4800159
 US5854033
 US6174670
 US2009137404
 US2010295819
    - BODENREIDER, "The Unified Medical Language System (UMLS): integrating biomedical terminology", Nucleic Acids Research, (20040000), vol. 32, pages D267 - D270
    - PINERO et al., "DisGeNET: a discovery platform for the dynamical exploration of human diseases and their genes", Database, (20150000), pages 1 - 17
    - LANGFELDER et al., "WGCNA: an R package for weighted correlation network analysis", BMC Bioinformatics, (20080000), vol. 9, no. 559, pages 1 - 13