Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471862

EP3471862 - MULTISTAGE OSMOTICALLY ASSISTED REVERSE OSMOSIS SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  22.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Battelle Memorial Institute
505 King Avenue
Columbus, OH 43201 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / BLOHM, Kurt
505 King Avenue
Columbus, OH 43201 / US
02 / PETERSON, Richard
505 King Avenue
Columbus, OH 43201 / US
03 / LANE, Ann E.
505 King Avenue
Columbus, OH 43201 / US
04 / WINECKI, Slawomir
505 King Avenue
Columbus, OH 43201 / US
05 / ARGUMEDO, Darwin
505 King Avenue
Columbus, OH 43201 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Kador & Partner PartG mbB
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17729715.702.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US35724
Priority number, dateUS201662346116P06.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662346116 P
US201762467858P07.03.2017         Original published format: US 201762467858 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2017213992
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3471862
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:B01D61/02, B01D61/06, B01D61/08, B01D61/58
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR MEHRSTUFIGE, OSMOTISCH UNTERSTÜTZTE UMKEHROSMOSE[2019/17]
English:MULTISTAGE OSMOTICALLY ASSISTED REVERSE OSMOSIS SYSTEM AND METHOD[2019/17]
French:OSMOSE INVERSE ÉTAGÉE À COURANT TRANSVERSAL[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase29.11.2018National basic fee paid 
29.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
29.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
29.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US9206060  (ABUSHARKH BASEL [SA]) [A] 1-19 * column 1, lines 34-40 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 4 *;
 [XA]US2010032377  (WOHLERT CALVIN WADE [US]) [X] 18,19 * paragraphs [0045] , [0074] , [0185]; figure 2a * * figures 1-10 * * the whole document * [A] 1-17;
 [XA]US2010294718  (TREYVAUD JEAN-FRANCOIS [CH]) [X] 18,19 * paragraphs [0014] , [0029]; figures 1,2 * [A] 1-17