Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465181

EP3465181 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE MICROSTRUCTURE OF A METAL PRODUCT, AND METALLURGICAL INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.01.2020
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020(Expected) grantpublished on 19.02.2020  [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMS Group GmbH
Eduard-Schloemann-Str. 4
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / BIGLARI, Mostafa
Lissabonner Strasse 2
70173 Stuttgart / DE
02 / SOMMERS, Ulrich
Kleiner Torfbruch 9
40627 Düsseldorf / DE
03 / KLINKENBERG, Christian
Im Siepen 30 a
58313 Herdecke / DE
04 / RENARD, Michel
Quai de Rome 66/031
4000 Liege / BE
05 / RAYMOND, Guy
Rue Sompre 31
4400 Ivoz-Ramet / BE
06 / PENSIS, Oliver
Rue voie des Vaux 337
4420 Montegnee / BE
07 / TERLAU, Tobias
Schillerstrasse 10
42489 Wülfrath / DE
08 / KRAUTHÄUSER, Horst
Gießerweg 28
42579 Heiligenhau / DE
 [2019/16]
Former [2019/15]01 / BIGLARI, Mostafa
Herrenhauser Straße 7
40822 Mettmann / DE
02 / SOMMERS, Ulrich
Kleiner Torfbruch 9
40627 Düsseldorf / DE
03 / KLINKENBERG, Christian
Im Siepen 30 a
58313 Herdecke / DE
04 / RENARD, Michel
Quai de Rome 66/031
4000 Liege / BE
05 / RAYMOND, Guy
Rue Sompre 31
4400 Ivoz-Ramet / BE
06 / PENSIS, Oliver
Rue voie des Vaux 337
4420 Montegnee / BE
07 / TERLAU, Tobias
Schillerstrasse 10
42489 Wülfrath / DE
08 / KRAUTHÄUSER, Horst
Gießerweg 28
42579 Heiligenhau / DE
Representative(s)Klüppel, Walter
Hemmerich & Kollegen
Patentanwälte
Hammerstraße 2
57072 Siegen / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17729796.724.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP62527
Priority number, dateDE20161020918125.05.2016         Original published format: DE102016209181
DE20171020857619.05.2017         Original published format: DE102017208576
[2019/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017202904
Date:30.11.2017
Language:DE
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465181
Date:10.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3465181
Date:19.02.2020
Language:DE
[2020/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N23/20, G01N33/20, G01N23/20008, // C21D9/56, B21B38/02
[2019/37]
Former International [2019/15]G01N23/20, G01N33/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERMITTELN EINER MIKROSTRUKTUR EINES METALLPRODUKTS SOWIE METALLURGISCHE ANLAGE[2019/15]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE MICROSTRUCTURE OF A METAL PRODUCT, AND METALLURGICAL INSTALLATION[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UNE MICROSTRUCTURE D'UN PRODUIT MÉTALLIQUE ET INSTALLATION MÉTALLURGIQUE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.03.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
02.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.09.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.01.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
07.01.2020Fee for grant paid
07.01.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]EP2674240  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,14-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0008] , [0011] , [0015] , [0016]; claim 2 * [Y] 10-12 [I] 3,6-9,13;
 [A]DE556383  (WILLI M COHN DR ING) [A] 1-17 * page 2, lines 10-31; claim - *;
 [I]  - HERMANN-J. KOPINECK ET AL, "Industrial on-line texture determination in rolled steel strips", JOURNAL OF NONDESTRUCTIVE EVALUATION., US, (19930301), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1007/BF00565904, ISSN 0195-9298, pages 13 - 19, XP055285643 [I] 1-3,13,16,17 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00565904
 [Y]  - Timo Huttunen, "Ultra-thin X-ray window for detector applications", (20131212), URL: http://www.esa-tec.eu/workspace/assets/files/tdo0066-52aaefcf77e9f.pdf, (20170814), XP055398417 [Y] 10-12 * the whole document *
 [A]  - R. M. FOWLER, "Some Recent Developments and Current Problems in Metal Analysis", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, US, (19591201), vol. 31, no. 12, doi:10.1021/ac60156a018, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 1949 - 1951, XP055398343 [A] 1-17 * page 1950, column r *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac60156a018
 [A]  - O. Bruchwald ET AL, "Non-destructive in situ monitoring of the microstructural development in high performance steel components during heat treatment", La Metallurgia Italiana, (20151101), URL: http://www.aimnet.it/allpdf/pdf_pubbli/nov15/Bruchwald.pdf, (20170811), XP055398350 [A] 1-17 * the whole document *
by applicantJPS6110749
 JP3817812B
 JPS561341
 DE3825830
 EP0352423