Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465126

EP3465126 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CHECKING A COMPONENT FOR THE EXISTENCE OF A PREDETERMINED TARGET CONDITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.01.2020Change - classificationpublished on 05.02.2020 [2020/06]
03.01.2020Change - classificationpublished on 05.02.2020 [2020/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huellmandel, Steven
Pirker Str. 44
92699 Bechtsrieth / DE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Benninger, Johannes
Benninger Patentanwaltskanzlei
Dr.-Leo-Ritter-Strasse 5
93049 Regensburg / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17729812.229.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP62858
Priority number, dateDE20161011024302.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016110243
[2019/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017207470
Date:07.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465126
Date:10.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01M13/025, H05K9/00, G01M15/02
[2020/06]
Former International [2019/15]G01M13/02, G01M15/02, H05K9/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERPRÜFEN EINES BAUTEILS AUF VORHANDENSEIN EINER VORGEGEBENEN SOLL-BESCHAFFENHEIT[2019/15]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CHECKING A COMPONENT FOR THE EXISTENCE OF A PREDETERMINED TARGET CONDITION[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE D'UNE PIÈCE QUANT À LA PRÉSENCE D'UN ÉTAT DE CONSIGNE PRÉDÉFINI[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase21.12.2018National basic fee paid 
21.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
21.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YD]DE102012212886  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [YD] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [YD]US6597255  (TURTON BRIAN C [GB], et al) [YD] 1-12 * abstract * * column 2, line 27 - line 46 * * column 8, line 14 - line 27 * * figure 1 *
by applicantDE102012212886
 US6597255
 US8460117