Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472275

EP3472275 - LUBRICANT POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.11.2019
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Total Marketing Services
24 Cours Michelet
92800 Puteaux / FR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / LANÇON, Denis
38 Rue du Château
F-69680 Chassieu / FR
02 / DOYEN, Valérie
10 Rue du Mollard
F-38080 Four / FR
03 / ROGUES DE FURSAC, Isabelle
26bis Rue des Bottières
F-69600 Oullins / FR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Corizzi, Valérie
PACT-IP
37, rue Royale
92210 Saint-Cloud / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17729882.516.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP64736
Priority number, dateEP2016030574017.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16305740
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216327
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472275
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C10M145/14, C10M169/04, C10N30/06, C10N30/12, C10N40/25, C10N40/26
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SCHMIERMITTELPOLYMERE[2019/17]
English:LUBRICANT POLYMERS[2019/17]
French:POLYMÈRES LUBRIFIANTS[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2018National basic fee paid 
20.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
20.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US4438005  (ZOLESKI BENJAMIN H [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0823472  (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 4, lines 27-55; page 5, line 55 to page 6, line 19;; claims 1-4,6,12 *;
 [A]WO9910454  (ROEHM ROHMAX HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 9, lines 10-26; page 22, polymers 3-9,11,13,14;; claims 1,5-7,10 *;
 [A]EP1418187  (ETHYL CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-4,8,9,12,13 *