Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468517

EP3468517 - SIDE SUPPORT FOR A POSTURAL SUPPORT SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sunrise Medical GmbH
Kahlbachring 2-4
69254 Malsch/Heidelberg / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DAVIES, David
9 Eltham Drive Priorslee
Telford Shropshire TF2 9NQ / GB
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Holzwarth-Rochford, Andreas
Jones Day
Nextower
Thurn-und-Taxis-Platz 6
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17729897.316.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP64810
Priority number, dateEP2016017504317.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16175043
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216363
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468517
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61G5/10, A61G5/12
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:SEITENHALTER FÜR EINE HALTUNGSSITZSTÜTZE[2019/16]
English:SIDE SUPPORT FOR A POSTURAL SUPPORT SEAT[2019/16]
French:SUPPORT LATÉRAL POUR UN SIÈGE DE SOUTIEN POSTURAL[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2019National basic fee paid 
11.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
11.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2011265262  (DI LAURO MICHAEL C [US] ET AL) [X] 1-11,13 * paragraph [0077]; figure 11 * [I] 14,15;
 [X]WO2015174855  (SCARLETT ROUAND JAMES MORTIMER [NZ]; SCARLETT ROYDON MARK [NZ]) [X] 1-3,8-12,14,15 * page 6, lines 19-20; figures 1,2, 13 *;
 [A]US3829159  (LEFFLER D) [A] 1-15 * figures 1, 6-9 *
by applicantEP1374819