blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3468517 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3468517



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 175
07.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.10.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
07.10.2019 Claims Search / examination 4
07.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.10.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.07.2019 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
11.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.07.2019 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.06.2019 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
29.03.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
29.03.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.03.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
20.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
28.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.01.2019 Confirmation of effective date of early entry Search / examination 1
23.01.2019 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 5
11.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.01.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
11.01.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
11.01.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 12
11.01.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 12
11.01.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
04.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
26.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
08.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27
21.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
21.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 22
11.10.2017 Incoming letter related to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 2
18.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
18.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
18.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
23.06.2017 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 5
16.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
16.06.2017 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
16.06.2017 Claims PCT receiving Office 4
16.06.2017 Description PCT receiving Office 13
16.06.2017 Document concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 2
16.06.2017 Drawings PCT receiving Office 4
16.06.2017 Electronic request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 4