blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3468517


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.10.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019 Change - extension states published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
15.07.2019 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.07.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
29.03.2019 First examination report
26.03.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established
15.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
27.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
13.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
22.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
15.01.2019 Amendment by applicant
12.01.2019 Change - representative
12.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
06.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
28.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
16.08.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
23.06.2017 PCT data prior to European publication