Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466089

EP3466089 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR SELECTING SUPPLEMENTAL CONTENT FOR DISPLAY NEAR A USER DEVICE DURING PRESENTATION OF A MEDIA ASSET ON THE USER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rovi Guides, Inc.
2160 Gold Street
San Jose, CA 95002 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / LIN, Edison
1280 Sharon Park Drive
No. 28
Menlo Park CA 94025 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Pisani, Diana Jean , et al
Haley Guiliano International LLP
Central Court
25 Southampton Buildings
London WC2A 1AL / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17729971.626.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US34804
Priority number, dateUS20161516703527.05.2016         Original published format: US201615167035
US20161516714627.05.2016         Original published format: US201615167146
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017205812
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466089
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/41, H04N21/81, G06F3/147, G06F17/30, G09G3/00, H04N21/4223, H04N21/431, H04N21/435, H04N21/436
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR AUSWAHL VON ERGÄNZENDEM INHALT ZUR ANZEIGE IN DER NÄHE EINER BENUTZERVORRICHTUNG WÄHREND DER DARSTELLUNG EINES MEDIENBESTANDS AUF DER BENUTZERVORRICHTUNG[2019/15]
English:METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR SELECTING SUPPLEMENTAL CONTENT FOR DISPLAY NEAR A USER DEVICE DURING PRESENTATION OF A MEDIA ASSET ON THE USER DEVICE[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES POUR SÉLECTIONNER UN CONTENU SUPPLÉMENTAIRE À AFFICHER À PROXIMITÉ D'UN DISPOSITIF D'UTILISATEUR DURANT LA PRÉSENTATION D'UN CONTENU MULTIMÉDIA SUR LE DISPOSITIF D'UTILISATEUR[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase23.11.2018National basic fee paid 
23.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
23.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
23.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2014032565  (PARKER BENJAMIN J [US]) [X] 1,2,7,11,12,17,21,22,27,31,32,37,41,42,47 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0075] * [Y] 8-10,18-20,28-30,38-40,48-50 [I] 3-6,13-16,23-26,33-36,43-46;
 [IAY]US2011181780  (BARTON JAMES M [US]) [I] 1,11,21,31,41 * paragraphs [0031] , [0033] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0078] * [A] 3,6,13,16,23,26,33,36,43,46 [Y] 8,18,28,38,48;
 [YA]US2014331264  (SCHNEIDERMAN HENRY WILL [US], et al) [Y] 9,10,19,20,29,30,39,40,49,50 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0034] * [A] 1,11,21,31,41
by applicantUS6564378
 US6239794
 US2005251827
 US7165098
 US2002174430
 US2010153885
 US7761892
 US8046801