Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465969

EP3465969 - TIME DIVISION MULTIPLEXING OF SYNCHRONIZATION CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / ISLAM, Muhammad Nazmul
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
02 / ABEDINI, Navid
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
03 / LUO, Tao
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
04 / SUBRAMANIAN, Sundar
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
05 / CEZANNE, Juergen
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
06 / SAMPATH, Ashwin
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
07 / GOROKHOV, Alexei Yurievitch
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
08 / LI, Junyi
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
09 / SADIQ, Bilal
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17729989.831.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US35281
Priority number, dateUS201662344381P01.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662344381 P
US201662350171P14.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662350171 P
US201662401801P29.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662401801 P
US201662410073P19.10.2016         Original published format: US 201662410073 P
US20171560886930.05.2017         Original published format: US201715608869
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210339
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465969
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L5/00, H04L27/26
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:ZEITMULTIPLEXING VON SYNCHRONISATIONSKANÄLEN[2019/15]
English:TIME DIVISION MULTIPLEXING OF SYNCHRONIZATION CHANNELS[2019/15]
French:MULTIPLEXAGE PAR RÉPARTITION DANS LE TEMPS DE CANAUX DE SYNCHRONISATION[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase15.11.2018National basic fee paid 
15.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
15.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
15.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]WO2010015102  (NXP BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,4-7,17,20-23,34,37-40,50,53-56,67,70-73,83,86-89,100,101 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0039] * * figures 4-9 * [Y] 2,3,18,19,35,36,51,52,68,69,84,85 [I] 8,9,24,25,41,42,57,58,74,75,90,91;
 [Y]  - SHARP, "Synchronization signal design for NB-IoT", vol. RAN WG1, no. Anaheim, USA; 20151115 - 20151122, (20151115), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-157119, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20151115), XP051040013 [Y] 2,18,35,51,68,84 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - ZTE ET AL, "Performance evaluation of numerology candidates", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160514), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-164272 PERF NUMEROLOGY CANDIDATES, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_85/Docs/, (20160514), XP051090020 [Y] 3,19,36,52,69,85 * paragraph [0001]; table A1 *
 [A]  - LG ELECTRONICS HUAWEI HISILICON, "WF on Supporting different Numerologies in a NR carrier", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160530), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-165837 WF ON SUBBAND V3, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_85/Docs/, (20160530), XP051112005 [A] 10-16,26-33,43-49,59-66,76-82,92-99 * the whole document *