Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468409

EP3468409 - METHODS FOR MAKING PRECISION APPLICATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / STANLEY, Scott Kendyl
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
02 / FARRELL, Michael Sean
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
03 / RAPACH, Andrew Paul
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP
Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor
Amstelplein 1
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17730002.701.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US35404
Priority number, dateUS201662347191P08.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662347191 P
US201762475254P23.03.2017         Original published format: US 201762475254 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213951
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468409
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A45D34/04, A45D44/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PRÄZISIONSAPPLIKATOREN[2019/16]
English:METHODS FOR MAKING PRECISION APPLICATORS[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION D'APPLICATEURS DE PRÉCISION[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase28.12.2018National basic fee paid 
28.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
28.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
28.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2014142439  (A L MEDIA CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5,8,11-13 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP2460435  (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-11,13 * paragraphs [0016] - [0027] - [0040] - [0060]; figure - *;
 [X]US2010191314  (YOUNG DANIEL L [US]) [X] 1-4,7-10 * paragraphs [0022] - [0041]; figure - *;
 [XP]WO2017053489  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [XP] 1-4,6,8-14 * page 2, line 18 - page 14, line 10; figure - *
by applicantUS5366782