Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469773

EP3469773 - POWER MANAGEMNET BY ALTERING BIAS VOLTAGE ACCORDING TO PEAK TO AVERAGE POWER RATIO (PAPR) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
International IP Administration
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KUMAR, Akash
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego California 92121 / US
02 / MAHESHWARI, Ankit
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego California 92121 / US
03 / SUNDARA RAGHAVAN, Revathi
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego California 92121 / US
04 / GENG, Jifeng
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego California 92121 / US
05 / VADLAMUDI, Niranjan Kumar
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego California 92121 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17730005.001.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US35441
Priority number, dateUS201662349755P14.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662349755 P
US20161526300712.09.2016         Original published format: US201615263007
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218203
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469773
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L27/26, H03F1/02
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:LEISTUNGSVERWALTUNG DURCH VERÄNDERUNG DER VORSPANNUNG JE NACH SPITZENWERT-ZU-MITTELWERT-LEISTUNGSVERHÄLTNIS (PAPR)[2019/16]
English:POWER MANAGEMNET BY ALTERING BIAS VOLTAGE ACCORDING TO PEAK TO AVERAGE POWER RATIO (PAPR)[2019/16]
French:GESTION DE PUISSANCE PAR MODIFICATION DE LA TENSION DE POLARISATION EN FONCTION DU RAPPORT DE PUISSANCE CRÊTE SUR MOYENNE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase25.10.2018National basic fee paid 
25.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.04.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
25.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]US2012219048  (CAMUFFO ANDREA [DE] ET AL) [I] 1-30 * abstract * * paragraph [[0017]] - paragraph [[0019]] * * paragraph [[0023]] - paragraph [[0024]] * * paragraph [[0038]] - paragraph [[0039]] * * paragraph [[0063]] * * paragraph [[0075]] - paragraph [[0076]] * * paragraph [[0083]]; figure 1 * * figure 3 * * figure 5 * * figure 6 * * figure 9 * * figure 11 *;
 [XI]US6535066  (PETSKO DAVID [US]) [X] 25,27,28 * abstract * * figure 4 * * column 2 - column 5 * [I] 15-24,26,29,30;
 [XI]US2011130105  (CHAN WEN-YEN [CA] ET AL) [X] 15-21,24-30 * paragraph [[0025]] - paragraph [[0036]] * * paragraph [[0064]] - paragraph [[0090]] * * figure 1 * * figure 1A * * figure 3 * * figure 3A * * figure 4 * * figure 5 * * figure 6 * * figure 7 * [I] 22,23