Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469776

EP3469776 - NETWORK-VISITABILITY DETECTION CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KAAL, Madis
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / GARCIA, Aurelio Navarro Belletti
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17730010.002.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US35572
Priority number, dateUS20161517884110.06.2016         Original published format: US201615178841
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213971
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469776
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04W12/08, H04W48/20
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:STEUERUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG DER NETZWERKBESUCHBARKEIT[2019/16]
English:NETWORK-VISITABILITY DETECTION CONTROL[2019/16]
French:COMMANDE DE DÉTECTION DE CAPACITÉ DE VISITE DE RÉSEAU[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase12.11.2018National basic fee paid 
12.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
12.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]EP2194737  (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US2015146703  (SON MASAYOSHI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0016] *;
 [A]US2014075011  (SALKINTZIS APOSTOLIS K [GR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] *