Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469835

EP3469835 - MULTI-INTERFACE POWER-AWARE NETWORKING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / SRINIVASAN, Harish
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / FLORES ASSAD, Javier N.
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
03 / GRAY, James C.
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
04 / POWELL, David Richard, Jr.
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
05 / SCHULTZ, Benjamin M.
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
06 / WOOD, Ryan Gregory
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17730028.206.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36026
Priority number, dateUS20161517985610.06.2016         Original published format: US201615179856
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214070
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469835
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W48/18, H04W88/06, H04L12/24
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:LEISTUNGSBEWUSSTE MULTISCHNITTSTELLEN-VERNETZUNG[2019/16]
English:MULTI-INTERFACE POWER-AWARE NETWORKING[2019/16]
French:MISE EN RÉSEAU SENSIBLE À LA CONSOMMATION D'ÉNERGIE À INTERFACES MULTIPLES[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase08.11.2018National basic fee paid 
08.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
08.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
08.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP2091190  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1,8,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0010] - [ 0026] - [0030] * [I] 2-7,9-12,14,15;
 [A]US2014235244  (HINMAN BRIAN L [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *