Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465091

EP3465091 - DETERMINING SPEED INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.09.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HERE Global B.V.
Kennedyplein 222-226
5611 ZT Eindhoven / NL
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / ANASTASSOV, Anton
3912 Broadmoor Circle
Naperville, Illinois 60564 / US
02 / JANG, Dongwook
6646 Fernwood Drive
Lisle, Illinois 60532 / US
03 / GIURGIU, Gavril
491 South Commons Court
Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17730070.424.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP62633
Priority number, dateUS20161516409625.05.2016         Original published format: US201615164096
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017202970
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465091
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01C21/32, G08G1/01, G08G1/052, G08G1/09, G08G1/097, G01C21/34
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:BESTIMMUNG VON GESCHWINDIGKEITSINFORMATIONEN[2019/15]
English:DETERMINING SPEED INFORMATION[2019/15]
French:DÉTERMINATION D'INFORMATIONS DE VITESSE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.11.2018National basic fee paid 
02.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
02.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2015300825  (MANOLIU ADRIAN-VICTOR [NL], et al) [X] 1-21 * figures 5A-5C * * figures 6A-6C * * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0017] - [0018] - [0021] - [0022] - [0037] , [0041] , [0061] - [0073] - [0105] * * paragraphs [0124] - [0125] - [0129] , [0149] , [0157] - [0158] - [0167] *;
 [A]US2014149028  (CHAPMAN CRAIG H [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *