Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471636

EP3471636 - INTERNAL PLATE FIXATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Orthofix S.R.L.
Via delle Nazioni 9
37012 Bussolengo (Verona) / IT
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / VENTURINI, Daniele
Via dei Carpini 36
37064 Povegliano Veronese (VR) / IT
02 / MAGNI, Marco
Via Bologna 88
44122 Ferrara / IT
03 / ZACCARIA, Andrea
Via Fracanzana 16
37039 Tregnago (VR) / IT
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Zelioli, Giovanni
Botti & Ferrari S.r.l.
Via Cappellini, 11
20124 Milano / IT
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17730071.224.05.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP62653
Priority number, dateEP2016042505917.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16425059
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017215896
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471636
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/80
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:INTERNE PLATTENFIXIERVORRICHTUNG[2019/17]
English:INTERNAL PLATE FIXATION DEVICE[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION DE PLAQUE INTERNE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2018National basic fee paid 
12.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2017Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
12.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XDYI]US2014005729  (DIMATTEO KRISTIAN [US]) [XD] 1,6,7,11 * paragraph [0037]; figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0056]; figures 5, 6 * [Y] 4,5,12,13 [I] 2,3,14;
 [IY]US2013325073  (SIKORA GEORGE [US] ET AL) [I] 1-3,6-8,11,14 * paragraph [0031]; figure 2C * * paragraph [0040]; figures 6A-6C * [Y] 9,10;
 [ID]US8273111  (AMATO MATTHEW F [US] ET AL) [ID] 1-7,11,14 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2014277176  (BUCHANAN MATTHEW [US] ET AL) [Y] 4,5 * figure 7 *;
 [YD]US2015223852  (LIETZ EVA [CH] ET AL) [YD] 12,13 * figures 4, 6B, 7B *;
 [Y]EP2364658  (AAP IMPLANTATE AG [DE]) [Y] 9,10 * figures 5-7, 11, 12 *
by applicantUS8273111
 US2004111089
 US2014005729
 US2015223852