Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472293

EP3472293 - CONCENTRATED LIQUID DETERGENT HAVING A CONSTANT PH VALUE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / PEGELOW, Ulrich
Benrodestrasse 76
40597 Düsseldorf / DE
02 / SCHÜMANN, Sabine
Neukirchenerstrasse 37A
41470 Neuss / DE
03 / PLUSZYNSKI, Simon
Benrodestrasse 95
40597 Düsseldorf / DE
04 / BASTIGKEIT, Thorsten
Gennebreckerstrasse 248
42279 Wuppertal / DE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Kuhnert, Oliver
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstraße 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Kuhnert, Oliver
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Patente (FJI)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date17730137.114.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP64516
Priority number, dateDE20161021074416.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016210744
[2019/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216214
Date:21.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472293
Date:24.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/00, C11D3/04, C11D3/30, C11D1/83
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:KONZENTRIERTES FLÜSSIGWASCHMITTEL MIT KONSTANTEM PH-WERT[2019/17]
English:CONCENTRATED LIQUID DETERGENT HAVING A CONSTANT PH VALUE[2019/17]
French:DÉTERGENT À LESSIVE LIQUIDE CONCENTRÉ À PH CONSTANT[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
02.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US4105592  (COLLINS JEROME H) [X] 1,3-10 * columns 5-6; example I; claim - * [I] 1-10;
 [X]US4079078  (COLLINS JEROME H) [X] 1-10 * example IV; claim - *;
 [XI]US4075118  (GAULT TERRELL WILSON ET AL) [X] 1,3-10 * columns 11-12; examples I-VII; claim - * [I] 1-10;
 [XI]US4268262  (BECHSTEDT WOLFGANG) [X] 1,3-10 * example -; claim -; table - * [I] 1-10;
 [XI]US6239093  (FOLEY PETER ROBERT [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3-10 * examples 4,8,9; claim - * [I] 1-10;
 [XI]EP0100125  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,3-10 * page 10; examples I-V,VIII; claim - * [I] 1-10;
 [XI]WO9529224  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,3-10 * pages 33-34 * [I] 1-10