Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3472293 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3472293



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 129
14.06.2017 Electronic request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 4
14.06.2017 Document concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 2
14.06.2017 Description PCT receiving Office 18
14.06.2017 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
14.06.2017 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
14.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
23.06.2017 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 5
10.07.2017 Incoming letter related to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 1
24.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
24.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
24.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
21.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 21
21.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
08.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 23
26.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
02.01.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
02.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
02.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.02.2019 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
27.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
11.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.07.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
11.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
11.07.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
11.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.09.2019 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
24.09.2019 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
24.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1