blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3472293
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3472293Global Dossier 24.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
WO2017EP64516 14.06.2017
DE102016210744 16.06.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017216214Global Dossier 21.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
DE102016210744 16.06.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102016210744 21.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
DE102016210744 16.06.2016