Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471861

EP3471861 - POLLUTION CONTROL USING OZONE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University of Copenhagen
Nørregade 10
1165 Copenhagen K / DK
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / JOHNSSON, Matthew Stanley
Beslutsgränden 5
224 67 Lund / SE
02 / BUTCHER, Andrew Charles
Alstedvej 16
2700 Brønshøj / DK
03 / MEUSINGER, Carl
Jagtvej 25
3th.
2200 København N / DK
04 / KILPINEN, Kristoffer Skovlund
Augustagade 3
2. tv
2300 København S / DK
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Chas. Hude A/S
H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33
1780 Copenhagen V / DK
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17730181.916.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP64787
Priority number, dateEP2016017501617.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16175016
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216353
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471861
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/76, A61L9/015
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VERSCHMUTZUNGSKONTROLLE MITTELS OZON[2019/17]
English:POLLUTION CONTROL USING OZONE[2019/17]
French:LUTTE CONTRE LA POLLUTION À L'AIDE D'OZONE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase07.12.2018National basic fee paid 
07.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
07.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
07.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XDI]DE102005035951  (NONNENMACHER KLAUS [DE]) [XD] 1-6,8-12,14 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 2] , [0 24] , [0 47] - [0050] - [0 64]; figures 1,2,7; examples 1,3; claim - * [I] 7,13;
 [XD]US2003143140  (HWANG SHUEN-CHENG [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,4,6,8-14 * paragraphs [0044] - [0050]; figure 3 *;
 [XDI]DE102010017614  (NT ABLUFTTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1,2,4,6-8,10,12,14 * claim - * [I] 3,5,9,11;
 [XD]EP2072110  (ARN BV [NL]) [XD] 1,2,4,8-14 * paragraph [0049]; claim - *;
 [X]US2013296615  (LITTLEFORD WAYNE S [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-14 * paragraphs [0039] , [0 47] , [0 50] , [0 51] , [0 52] , [0 56] , [0 57]; figures 1,4,5 *
by applicantDE102005035951
 US2003143140
 DE102010017614
 EP2072110
    - PARK et al., Nonoscale Research Letters, (20120000), vol. 7, no. 14, pages 1 - 5