Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469096

EP3469096 - METHOD, COMPOSITION AND SENSOR FOR ANALYTE DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cambridge Display Technology Limited
Unit 12 Cardinal Park
Cardinal Way
Godmanchester
Cambridgeshire PE29 2XG / GB
For all designated states
Sumitomo Chemical Company Limited
Floor 18 Sumitomo Twin Buildings
27-1 Shinkawa 2-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8260 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BEHRENDT, Jonathan
c/o CDT Ltd
Unit 12 Cardinal Park
Cardinal Way
Godmanchester Cambridgeshire PE29 2XG / GB
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Gilani, Anwar , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
Byron House
Cambridge Business Park
Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17730248.609.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017GB51689
Priority number, dateGB2016001034714.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201610347
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216525
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469096
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/54, C12Q1/60, G01N33/52, G01N33/66
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND SENSOR ZUM NACHWEIS VON ANALYTEN[2019/16]
English:METHOD, COMPOSITION AND SENSOR FOR ANALYTE DETECTION[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ, COMPOSITION ET CAPTEUR DE DÉTECTION D'ANALYTE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
10.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2015091772  (LUDWIG MAXIMILIANS UNIVERSITÄT MÜNCHEN [DE]) [X] 1-3,18 * see page 4; page 10 - page 13; example -; claims 1-7 *;
 [A]EP2319937  (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0035]; claim - *;
 [A]US2002137027  (DURKOP AXEL [DE]) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040]; figures 6,7,8; examples 1,2,4,18; claims 1-21 *
 [XDI]  - RONG HU ET AL, "An efficient fluorescent sensing platform for biomolecules based on fenton reaction triggered molecular beacon cleavage strategy", BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, NL, (20130301), vol. 41, doi:10.1016/j.bios.2012.09.013, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 442 - 445, XP055404820 [XD] 1-3,8,13,15,17 * see abstract, last paragraph bridging pages 442-443, sections 2.2 and 3.1, last paragraph on page 444, and conclusions on page 445.;; figure - * [I] 4-7,9-12,14,16,18-22

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bios.2012.09.013
 [XI]  - YUN SHI ET AL, "Fe3O4 peroxidase mimetics as a general strategy for the fluorescent detection of H2O2-involved systems", TALANTA, NL, (20140703), vol. 130, doi:10.1016/j.talanta.2014.06.053, ISSN 0039-9140, pages 259 - 264, XP055404836 [X] 1-3,7,8,13,15 * page 260 - page 263; figure - * [I] 4-6,9-12,14,16-22

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.talanta.2014.06.053
 [I]  - WOODWARD J ET AL, "Coupling of glucose oxidase and Fenton's reaction for a simple and inexpensive assay of @b-glucosidase", ENZYME AND MICROBIAL TECHNOLOGY, STONEHAM, MA, US, vol. 7, no. 9, doi:10.1016/0141-0229(85)90046-8, ISSN 0141-0229, (19850901), pages 449 - 453, (19850901), XP023678283 [I] 1-22 * page 449 - page 451; figure - *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0141-0229(85)90046-8
 [XI]  - CHIH T ET AL, "Glucose sensing based on an effective conversion of O2 and H2O2 into superoxide anion radical with clay minerals", JOURNAL OF ELECTROANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY AND INTERFACIAL ELECTROCHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 581, no. 2, ISSN 0022-0728, (20050801), pages 159 - 166, (20050801), XP027851317 [X] 1-3,9,12,13,17,22 * see Scheme 1 and scheme 2; page 160 - page 164; figure - * [I] 4-8,10,11,14-16,18-21