Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469399

EP3469399 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR USE IN REMOTE SENSING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.09.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee 
03.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sgurrenergy Limited
St Vincent Plaza
319 St Vincent Street
Glasgow G25LP / GB
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / CLIVE, Peter James Macdonald
12 Third Avenue
Glasgow G44 4TH / GB
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Murray, David Craig
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow G2 7JS / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17730253.612.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017GB51704
Priority number, dateGB2016001025913.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201610259
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216531
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469399
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01S17/58, G01S17/95, G01S15/58
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER FERNMESSUNG[2019/16]
English:METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR USE IN REMOTE SENSING[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DESTINÉS À L'UTILISATION DANS LA DÉTECTION À DISTANCE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2018National basic fee paid 
12.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
12.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201903   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2019
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2013099497  (BOWYER ROBERT [GB] ET AL) [X] 1-6,36-43,52,69 * paragraphs [0036] - [0060] * [I] 7-35,44-51,53-78;
 [I]US2015093243  (CANAL VILA MARC [ES] ET AL) [I] 1-78 * paragraphs [0034] - [0043] *;
 [I]WO2011150942  (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]; WESTERGAARD CARSTEN HEIN [US]) [I] 1-78 * pages 4-7 *;
 [I]DE102012019663  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [I] 1-78 * the whole document *